Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nazzareno Marconi

Bishop of Macerata-Tolentino-Recanati-Cingoli-Treia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Feb 1958 BornCittą di Castello
2 Jul 198325.4Ordained PriestPriest of Cittą di Castello, Italy
3 Jun 201456.3AppointedBishop of Macerata-Tolentino-Recanati-Cingoli-Treia, Italy
13 Jul 201456.4Ordained BishopBishop of Macerata-Tolentino-Recanati-Cingoli-Treia, Italy
27 Jul 201456.5InstalledBishop of Macerata-Tolentino-Recanati-Cingoli-Treia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Nazzareno Marconi:
Bishop Nazzareno Marconi (born ) Bishop of Macerata-Tolentino-Recanati-Cingoli-Treia

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Macerata-Tolentino-Recanati-Cingoli-Treia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Jun 2014
  • ob/i: CB, 3 Jun 2014
  • c2: CB, 29 Jun 2014
  • c34: CB, 7 Jul 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 8 Jul 2014