Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ventura Bufalini

Deceased

Bishop of Terni, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
10 Jan 1498AppointedBishop of CittÓ di Castello, Italy
17 Apr 1499AppointedBishop of Terni, Italy
15 Aug 1504DiedBishop of Terni, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ventura Bufalini
Bishop Ventura Bufalini (died ) Bishop of Terni

Source(s):
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 213
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 168, and Page 130
  • b: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1,498, Number 16*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast