Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Urru

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Città di Castello, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Dec 1915Born
28 Jun 194226.5Ordained PriestPriest
7 Mar 197155.1AppointedBishop of Ampurias e Tempio, Italy
28 Mar 197155.2Ordained BishopBishop of Ampurias e Tempio, Italy
21 Apr 198266.3AppointedBishop of Città di Castello, Italy
7 Feb 199175.1RetiredBishop of Città di Castello, Italy
2 Feb 200286.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Città di Castello, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Urru
Bishop Carlo Urru (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Città di Castello

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTodi

  • a priest for 59.5 years
  • a bishop for 30.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast