Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Fiordelli

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Prato, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jan 1916Born
6 Nov 193822.8Ordained PriestPriest of Città di Castello, Italy
7 Jul 195438.4AppointedBishop of Prato, Italy
3 Oct 195438.7Ordained BishopBishop of Prato, Italy
17 Oct 195438.7InstalledBishop of Prato, Italy
7 Dec 199175.9RetiredBishop of Prato, Italy
23 Dec 200488.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Prato, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Fiordelli
Bishop Pietro Fiordelli (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Prato

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCittà di Castello

  • a priest for 66.1 years
  • a bishop for 50.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1954
  • ob/obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 157, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast