Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luca Antonio Eustachi

Deceased

Bishop of Città di Castello, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Oct 1643Born
9 Mar 169349.3AppointedBishop of Città di Castello, Italy
24 Mar 169349.4Ordained BishopBishop of Città di Castello, Italy
4 Nov 171572.0DiedBishop of Città di Castello, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luca Antonio Eustachi
Bishop Luca Antonio Eustachi (born , died ) Bishop of Città di Castello

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 22.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 160
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1693, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast