Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Achille Cardinal Grassi

Deceased

Administrator of Bologna

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere

Titular Bishop of Pomaria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Feb 1456BornBologna
13 Feb 150650.0Ordained BishopBishop
14 Feb 150650.0AppointedBishop of Cittą di Castello, Italy
10 Mar 151155.1Elevated to Cardinal
17 Mar 151155.1InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Sisto
30 May 151155.3AppointedBishop of Bologna, Italy
25 Jul 151155.4InstalledBishop of Bologna, Italy
1515¹58.9ResignedBishop of Cittą di Castello, Italy
6 Jul 151761.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
8 Jan 151861.9ResignedBishop of Bologna, Italy
3 Mar 151862.0AppointedAdministrator of Bologna, Italy
9 Aug 152165.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Pomaria
22 Nov 152367.8DiedAdministrator of Bologna, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Achille Grassi:
Cardinal Achille Grassi (born , died ) Administrator of Bologna

  • a bishop for 17.8 years
  • a cardinal for 12.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 10 Mar 1511
  • c2: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 168
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013