Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luca Semproni

Deceased

Bishop of Città di Castello, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
26 Apr 1610AppointedBishop of Città di Castello, Italy
9 May 1610Ordained BishopBishop of Città di Castello, Italy
15 Jan 1616DiedBishop of Città di Castello, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luca Semproni
Bishop Luca Semproni (died ) Bishop of Città di Castello

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRimini, Diocese of Rimini

  • a bishop for 5.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 152
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 48, Number 263
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1610, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast