Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Alessandro Muzi

Deceased

Bishop of CittÓ di Castello


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1772BornRoma
20 Dec 179422.9Ordained PriestPriest
18 Apr 182351.2AppointedApostolic Delegate to Chile
16 May 182351.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Philippi
25 May 182351.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Philippi
19 Dec 182553.9AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of CittÓ di Castello, Italy
30 Nov 184977.9DiedBishop of CittÓ di Castello, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Alessandro Muzi
Archbishop Giovanni Alessandro Muzi (born , died ) Bishop of CittÓ di Castello

  • a priest for 54.9 years
  • a bishop for 26.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1837
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 152, and Page 306
  • ab/1823: LB, 20 Jul 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1823, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 27 May 2016