Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Antonio Mondelli

Deceased

Bishop of Città di Castello


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Feb 1756BornRome
14 Apr 178125.2Ordained PriestPriest
23 Sep 180549.6AppointedBishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy
29 Sep 180549.6Ordained BishopBishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy
26 Sep 181458.6AppointedBishop of Città di Castello, Italy
2 Mar 182569.1DiedBishop of Città di Castello, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Antonio Mondelli:
Bishop Francesco Antonio Mondelli (born , died ) Bishop of Città di Castello

  • a priest for 43.9 years
  • a bishop for 19.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 152, and Page 362

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013