Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Lattanzi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Città di Castello, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jan 1699³Born
20 Dec 172122.9Ordained PriestPriest
23 Feb 175051.1AppointedBishop of Città di Castello, Italy
1 Mar 175051.1Ordained BishopBishop of Città di Castello, Italy
23 Feb 178283.1ResignedBishop of Città di Castello, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Lattanzi
Bishop Giovanni Battista Lattanzi (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Città di Castello

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFossombrone

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1775
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 167
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1750, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast