Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Maria Sebastiani, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Bishop of Città di Castello, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1620¹Born
14 Dec 165939.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Malabar, India
14 Dec 165939.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Hierapolis in Isauria
15 Dec 165939.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hierapolis in Isauria
22 Aug 166747.6AppointedBishop of Bisignano, Italy
3 Oct 167252.7AppointedBishop of Città di Castello, Italy
15 Oct 168969.7DiedBishop of Città di Castello, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Maria Sebastiani
Bishop Giuseppe Maria Sebastiani O.C.D. (born 1620, died ) Bishop of Città di Castello

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCapriola

  • a bishop for 29.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 115, and Page 203
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 119, and Page 160
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,845
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,659, Number 36
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 21, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast