Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Vitellozzo Cardinal Vitelli

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of CittÓ di Castello, Italy

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata

Administrator of Carcassonne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1531²Born
20 Mar 155423.2AppointedBishop of CittÓ di Castello, Italy
15 Mar 155726.2Elevated to Cardinal
24 Mar 155726.2AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santi Sergio e Bacco
15 Apr 155726.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
6 Mar 155928.1AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Portico (Octaviae)
7 Feb 156029.0ResignedBishop of CittÓ di Castello, Italy
7 Feb 156029.0AppointedAdministrator of Imola, Italy
24 Oct 156130.8ResignedAdministrator of Imola, Italy
17 Nov 156433.8AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata
1567²36.0AppointedAdministrator of Carcassonne, France
19 Nov 156837.8DiedBishop Emeritus of CittÓ di Castello, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Vitellozzo Vitelli (VIAF: 89783746)
Vitellozzo Cardinal Vitelli (born 1531, died ) Bishop Emeritus of CittÓ di Castello

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCittÓ di Castello, Diocese of CittÓ di Castello
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)S. Maria in Via Lata, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a cardinal for 11.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 15 Mar 1557
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 169, and Page 152
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 213
  • od/c0: CB, 28 Jun 2015
  • b: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1554

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 8 Oct 2017