Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cesare Raccagna

Deceased

Bishop of Città di Castello, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
5 Jul 1632AppointedBishop of Città di Castello, Italy
29 Aug 1632Ordained BishopBishop of Città di Castello, Italy
24 Dec 1646DiedBishop of Città di Castello, Italy

MicroData Summary for Cesare Raccagna
Bishop Cesare Raccagna (died ) Bishop of Città di Castello

  • a bishop for 14.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 152
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 92, Number 553
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1632, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast