Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Costantino Bonelli

Deceased

Bishop of CittÓ di Castello, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1525²Born
7 Feb 156035.0AppointedBishop of CittÓ di Castello, Italy
Apr 1560³35.2Ordained PriestPriest
17 Apr 156035.2Ordained BishopBishop of CittÓ di Castello, Italy
4 Apr 157247.2DiedBishop of CittÓ di Castello, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Costantino Bonelli
(WikiData: Q3695462)
Bishop Costantino Bonelli (born 1525, died ) Bishop of CittÓ di Castello

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Marino, Diocese of Montefeltro
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceSant'Agostino, Convent, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 12.0 years
  • a bishop for 11.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,813
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 169
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1560, Number 4
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 81, Number 6,584
  • c0+: AT, 5 Jul 2023
  • c0+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 257, Number 21,232

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 25 Feb 2024