Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-François Jamot

Deceased

Bishop of Peterborough, Ontario, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jun 1828Born
9 Oct 185325.2Ordained PriestPriest
3 Feb 187445.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Northern Canada
3 Feb 187445.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Sarepta
24 Feb 187445.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sarepta
11 Jul 188254.0AppointedBishop of Peterborough, Ontario, Canada
4 May 188657.8DiedBishop of Peterborough, Ontario, Canada

MicroData Summary for Jean-François Jamot
Bishop Jean-François Jamot (born , died ) Bishop of Peterborough

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChâtelard, France
Ordained BishopN.D. du Sacre-Coeur, Issoundun

  • a priest for 32.5 years
  • a bishop for 12.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 448, and Page 502
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1874, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast