Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pierre-Henri Gérault de Langalerie

Deceased

Archbishop of Auch


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Apr 1810BornSainte-Foy-la-Grande
20 Dec 183424.7Ordained PriestPriest
21 Feb 185746.8SelectedBishop of Belley, France
19 Mar 185746.9ConfirmedBishop of Belley, France
1 May 185747.0Ordained BishopBishop of Belley, France
10 Oct 187161.5SelectedArchbishop of Auch, France
27 Oct 187161.5ConfirmedArchbishop of Auch, France
12 Feb 188675.8DiedArchbishop of Auch, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Henri Gérault de Langalerie:
Archbishop Pierre-Henri Gérault de Langalerie (born , died ) Archbishop of Auch

  • a priest for 51.1 years
  • a bishop for 28.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 135, and Page 144

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013