Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop René-Alexandre Dupanloup

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Belley, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Feb 1923Born
15 Jun 194623.3Ordained PriestPriest of Annecy, France
29 Apr 197047.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Nice, France
29 Apr 197047.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Vagal
20 Jun 197047.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vagal
21 Dec 197350.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Belley, France
17 May 197552.2SucceededBishop of Belley, France
7 Nov 198663.7ResignedBishop of Belley, France
17 Oct 199471.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Belley, France

MicroData Summary for René-Alexandre Dupanloup (VIAF: 89064518)
Bishop René-Alexandre Dupanloup (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Belley

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEtaux
Ordained BishopSaint-Maurice, Church, Annecy, Diocese of Annecy
Death PlaceTalissieu

  • a priest for 48.3 years
  • a bishop for 24.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 10, Number 499

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast