Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Mondovi

Dioecesis Montis Regalis in Pedemonte o Montis Vici



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Luciano Pacomio, Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 5 June 1388
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Torino {Turin}
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Italy
  • Square Kilometers: 2,189 (845 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Piemonte
  • Official Web Site: http://www.diocesimondovi.it/
  • Mailing Address: Vescovado, Via Vasco 17, 12084 Mondovi [Cuneo], Italia
  • Telephone: 0174.56.73.05
  • Fax: 0174.55.35.33

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
5 June 1388ErectedDiocese of Asti Diocese of Mondovi (erected)
29 October 1511Territory LostDiocese of Mondovi Diocese of Saluzzo (erected)
17 July 1817Territory LostDiocese of Mondovi Diocese of Cuneo (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1821138,678.0%OTC
1835126OTC
1886172,468.0%5070142OTC
1950163,898163,98199.9%4363847434558815191ap1951
1970132,450132,500100.0%31055365362111470190ap1971
1980139,500140,50099.3%2701528548922215190ap1981
1990120,000120,50099.6%2111522653021304192ap1991
1999117,500118,00099.6%1771519261123288192ap2000
2000117,500118,00099.6%1731318663121272192ap2001
2001117,500118,00099.6%1661217866020262192ap2002
2002117,500118,00099.6%15917176667525267192ap2003
2003117,200118,00099.3%15119170689527258192ap2004
2004116,000119,00097.5%145181637111126251192ap2005
2013115,000127,80090.0%11771249271715164192ap2014

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_d, v3.1.7, 31 Aug 2016; Data: 21 Nov 2016