Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adolph Manier

Deceased

Bishop of Belley


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Sep 1851BornFoug
22 May 187523.7Ordained PriestPriest of Autun (-Châlon-sur-Saône-Mâcon), France
13 Apr 191058.6AppointedBishop of Belley, France
11 Jun 191058.7Ordained BishopBishop of Belley, France
30 Jul 192977.9DiedBishop of Belley, France

MicroData Summary for Adolph Manier:
Bishop Adolph Manier (born , died ) Bishop of Belley

  • a priest for 54.2 years
  • a bishop for 19.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 82
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1910, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013