Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Virgile-Joseph Béguin

Deceased

Archbishop of Auch (-Condom-Lectoure-Lombez)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Aug 1872BornThun-l'Evêque
12 Jun 189724.8Ordained PriestPriest
15 Nov 192957.3AppointedBishop of Belley, France
14 Jan 193057.4Ordained BishopBishop of Belley, France
24 Dec 193462.4AppointedArchbishop of Auch (-Condom-Lectoure-Lombez), France
2 Mar 195582.6DiedArchbishop of Auch (-Condom-Lectoure-Lombez), France

MicroData Summary for Virgile-Joseph Béguin:
Archbishop Virgile-Joseph Béguin (born , died ) Archbishop of Auch (-Condom-Lectoure-Lombez)

  • a priest for 57.7 years
  • a bishop for 25.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1930, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013