Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guy Claude Bagnard

Bishop Emeritus of Belley-Ars


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Apr 1937 BornMontceau-les-Mines
29 Jun 196528.2Ordained PriestPriest
8 Jul 198750.2AppointedBishop of Belley, France
4 Oct 198750.5Ordained BishopBishop of Belley, France
15 Jun 201275.2RetiredBishop of Belley-Ars, France

MicroData Summary for Guy Claude Bagnard:
Bishop Guy Claude Bagnard (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Belley-Ars

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Belley-Ars.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Number 9,161
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 139
  • r: Bollettino, 15 Jun 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013