Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Philippe Cardinal de La Chambre, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Frascati

Administrator of Quimper


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1490¹Born
7 Nov 153343.8Elevated to Cardinal
10 Nov 153343.8InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti
8 Jan 153545.0AppointedAdministrator of Belley, France
24 May 153848.3ResignedAdministrator of Belley, France
23 Mar 154151.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede
15 Feb 154252.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
24 Sep 154353.7AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
19 Jul 154656.5AppointedAdministrator of Quimper, France
21 Feb 155060.1DiedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Philippe de La Chambre (VIAF: 308742723)
Philippe Cardinal de La Chambre O.S.B. (born 1490, died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Frascati

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSavoy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)SS. Trinità al Monte Pincio, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 16.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 7 Nov 1533
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 178
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1543, Number 27*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast