Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guillaume de Varax

Deceased

Bishop of Lausanne, Switzerland


Events

DateEventTitle
22 Dec 1460SelectedBishop of Belley, France
5 Jan 1461ConfirmedBishop of Belley, France
31 Oct 1462AppointedBishop of Lausanne, Switzerland
11 Apr 1466³DiedBishop of Lausanne, Switzerland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Guillaume de Varax
Bishop Guillaume de Varax (died ) Bishop of Lausanne

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 103, and Page 173
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1461, Number 5*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.0, 30 Aug 2018; Data: 3 Sep 2018

Quantcast