Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Venedykt (Valery) Aleksiychuk, M.S.U.

Bishop of Saint Nicholas of Chicago (Ukrainian), Illinois, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jan 1968 Born
9 Oct 199123.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
29 Mar 199224.2Ordained PriestPriest of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
31 Dec 199527.9ProfessedPriest of Ukrainian Studite Monks (Ukrainian)
14 Jul 201042.4SelectedAuxiliary Bishop of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
3 Aug 201042.5ConfirmedAuxiliary Bishop of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
3 Aug 201042.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Germaniciana
5 Sep 201042.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Germaniciana
20 Apr 201749.2AppointedBishop of Saint Nicholas of Chicago (Ukrainian), Illinois, USA

MicroData Summary for Venedykt (Valery) Aleksiychuk (VIAF: 314896052)
Bishop Venedykt (Valery) Aleksiychuk M.S.U. (born ) Bishop of Saint Nicholas of Chicago

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBorshchivka

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Saint Nicholas of Chicago (Ukrainian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Aug 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 203, Number 16,781
  • ab: Bollettino, 20 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 20 Apr 2017