Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Volodymyr Sterniuk, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Lviv (Ukrainian)

Titular Archbishop of Marcianopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Feb 1907BornPustomyty
21 Sep 193124.6Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
19 Jul 196457.4Ordained BishopBishop
16 Jan 199183.9AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title), Auxiliary of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
16 Jan 199183.9ConfirmedTitular Archbishop of Marcianopolis
199688.9RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
29 Sep 199790.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Volodymyr Sterniuk:
Archbishop Volodymyr Sterniuk C.SS.R. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Lviv

  • a priest for 66.0 years
  • a bishop for 33.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117, Number 10,443
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125, Number 11,258
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 5 Apr 2014