Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mykhajlo Sabryha, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ternopil-Zboriv (Ukrainian), Ukraine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Nov 1940Born
8 Nov 197130.9ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
23 Feb 197433.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
24 Feb 197433.2Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
11 Oct 198645.8Ordained BishopBishop
16 Jan 199150.1ConfirmedAuxiliary Bishop of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
16 Jan 199150.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Bucellus
20 Apr 199352.4AppointedBishop of Ternopil (Ukrainian), Ukraine
29 Jun 200665.6DiedBishop of Ternopil-Zboriv (Ukrainian), Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Mykhajlo Sabryha
Bishop Mykhajlo Sabryha C.SS.R. (born , died ) Bishop of Ternopil-Zboriv

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBortkiv

  • a priest for 32.3 years
  • a bishop for 19.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 123, Number 11,054
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125, Number 11,267
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)
  • c0/od: CB, 15 Dec 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 4 Nov 2017