Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Marie Charles André Le Vert

Auxiliary Bishop of Bordeaux (-Bazas), France

Titular Bishop of Briançonnet


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Apr 1959 Born
10 Oct 198728.5Ordained PriestPriest
199535.7IncardinatedPriest of Tours, France
21 Nov 200546.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Meaux, France
21 Nov 200546.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Simidicca
8 Jan 200646.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Simidicca
7 Dec 200748.6AppointedBishop of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon), France
22 Jan 201555.7ResignedBishop of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon), France
9 Mar 201858.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bordeaux (-Bazas), France
9 Mar 201858.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Briançonnet

MicroData Summary for Jean-Marie Charles André Le Vert (VIAF: 102437703)
Bishop Jean-Marie Charles André Le Vert (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Bordeaux (-Bazas)

EventPlace
Birth PlacePapeete, Pacific (Oceania)
Ordained BishopCathedral, Meaux, Diocese of Meaux

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Bordeaux (-Bazas).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 Nov 2005
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Number 15,027
  • ab: Bollettino, 7 Dec 2007
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 213, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 22 Jan 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast