Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Roger Joseph Tort

Deceased

Bishop of Montauban


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Sep 1918BornLes Baudis-Montjoie
29 Jun 194829.8Ordained PriestPriest
2 Sep 197051.9AppointedBishop of Montauban, France
18 Oct 197052.1Ordained BishopBishop of Montauban, France
16 Jan 197556.3DiedBishop of Montauban, France

MicroData Summary for Roger Joseph Tort:
Bishop Roger Joseph Tort (born , died ) Bishop of Montauban

  • a priest for 26.5 years
  • a bishop for 4.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013