Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Maurice-Mathieu-Louis Rigaud

Deceased

Archbishop of Auch (-Condom-Lectoure-Lombez), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Oct 1912Born
15 Jun 193522.6Ordained PriestPriest
18 Sep 196148.9AppointedBishop of Pamiers (-Couserans-Mirepoix), France
21 Dec 196149.1Ordained BishopBishop of Pamiers (-Couserans-Mirepoix), France
16 Apr 196855.5AppointedArchbishop of Auch (-Condom-Lectoure-Lombez), France
29 Dec 198472.2DiedArchbishop of Auch (-Condom-Lectoure-Lombez), France

MicroData Summary for Maurice-Mathieu-Louis Rigaud
Archbishop Maurice-Mathieu-Louis Rigaud (born , died ) Archbishop of Auch (-Condom-Lectoure-Lombez)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontfavet

  • a priest for 49.5 years
  • a bishop for 23.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 429, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 551, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast