Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Léon-Raymond Soulier

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Limoges, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jan 1924Born
7 Sep 194723.6Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jun 197147.4AppointedBishop of Pamiers (-Couserans-Mirepoix), France
12 Sep 197147.6Ordained BishopBishop of Pamiers (-Couserans-Mirepoix), France
9 Jul 198763.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Limoges, France
13 Jul 198864.5SucceededBishop of Limoges, France
24 Oct 200076.7RetiredBishop of Limoges, France
25 Dec 201692.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Limoges, France

MicroData Summary for Léon-Raymond Soulier (VIAF: 222108545)
Bishop Léon-Raymond Soulier (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Limoges

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVillechailles
Death PlaceChirac

  • a priest for 69.2 years
  • a bishop for 45.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 26 Dec 2016
  • bp/dp: CB, 2 Jan 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.5, 27 Dec 2016; Data: 2 Jan 2017