Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henri Lugagne-Delpon

Deceased

Bishop of Pamiers (-Couserans-Mirepoix), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jan 1921Born
18 Oct 194827.7Ordained PriestPriest
31 May 196847.3AppointedBishop of Pamiers (-Couserans-Mirepoix), France
2 Jul 196847.4Ordained BishopBishop of Pamiers (-Couserans-Mirepoix), France
15 Dec 197049.9DiedBishop of Pamiers (-Couserans-Mirepoix), France

MicroData Summary for Henri Lugagne-Delpon
Bishop Henri Lugagne-Delpon (born , died ) Bishop of Pamiers (-Couserans-Mirepoix)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSorgues-Sur-L'Ouvèze
Ordained BishopCourt of Honor, Palais des Papes, Avignon, Archdiocese of Avignon (-Apt, Cavaillon, Carpentras, Orange, e Vaison)

  • a priest for 22.1 years
  • a bishop for 2.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 429
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 551, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast