Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Dagoberto Campos Salas

Apostolic Nuncio to Liberia

Titular Archbishop of Forontoniana

Apostolic Nuncio to Gambia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Mar 1966 Born
22 May 199428.1Ordained PriestPriest of Tilarán, Costa Rica
28 Jul 201852.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Liberia
28 Jul 201852.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Forontoniana
17 Aug 201852.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Gambia
29 Sep 201852.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Forontoniana

MicroData Summary for Dagoberto Campos Salas (VIAF: 19323447)
Archbishop Dagoberto Campos Salas (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Liberia

EventPlace
Birth PlacePuntarenas, Diocese of Tilarán, Costa Rica
Ordained BishopSt. Peter, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Liberia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 Jul 2018
  • ab: Bollettino, 17 Aug 2018
  • ob.loc: CB, 4 Sep 2018
  • ob/c2: CB, 25 Sep 2018
  • c34: CB, 2 Oct 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.1, 12 Sep 2018; Data: 3 Oct 2018

Quantcast