Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Renato Boccardo

Archbishop of Spoleto-Norcia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Dec 1952 Born
25 Jun 197724.5Ordained PriestPriest of Susa, Italy
29 Nov 200350.9AppointedSecretary of the Pontifical Council for Social Communications
29 Nov 200350.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Aquipendium
24 Jan 200451.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aquipendium
22 Feb 200552.1AppointedSecretary General of the Governatorate of Vatican City State
16 Jul 200956.5AppointedArchbishop of Spoleto-Norcia, Italy
11 Oct 200956.8InstalledArchbishop of Spoleto-Norcia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Renato Boccardo
Archbishop Renato Boccardo (born ) Archbishop of Spoleto-Norcia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSant’Ambrogio

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Spoleto-Norcia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 16 Jul 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 174, Number 14,516
  • ab: Bollettino, 22 Feb 2005

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast