Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Claudio Lurati, M.C.C.I.

Vicar Apostolic of Alexandria of Egypt {Alessandria di Egitto} (-Eliopoli di Egitto-Port-Said)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Feb 1962 Born
1985²22.8Temporary VowsMember of Comboni Missionaries of the Heart of Jesus
27 Mar 198927.0Perpetual VowsMember of Comboni Missionaries of the Heart of Jesus
23 Sep 198927.5Ordained PriestPriest of Comboni Missionaries of the Heart of Jesus
6 Aug 202058.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Alexandria of Egypt {Alessandria di Egitto} (-Eliopoli di Egitto-Port-Said)
30 Oct 202058.6Ordained BishopVicar Apostolic of Alexandria of Egypt {Alessandria di Egitto} (-Eliopoli di Egitto-Port-Said)

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Claudio Lurati
Bishop Claudio Lurati M.C.C.I. (born ) Vicar Apostolic of Alexandria of Egypt {Alessandria di Egitto} (-Eliopoli di Egitto-Port-Said)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceComo, Diocese of Como, Italy
Ordained PriestLipomo, Diocese of Como, Italy
Ordained BishopSan Giuseppe, Church, Cairo, Vicariate Apostolic of Alexandria of Egypt {Alessandria di Egitto} (-Eliopoli di Egitto-Port-Said)

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of Alexandria of Egypt {Alessandria di Egitto} (-Eliopoli di Egitto-Port-Said).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 6 Aug 2020
  • ob: CB, 23 Sep 2020
  • c2+: CB, 29 Oct 2020
  • ob.loc: AM, 23 Dec 2020
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 246, Number 20,533
  • c1: AM, 30 Aug 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 31 Aug 2021

Quantcast