Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henri Marie Charles Gufflet

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Limoges, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 May 1913Born
29 Jun 193623.0Ordained PriestPriest of Versailles, France
16 Dec 195946.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Limoges, France
16 Dec 195946.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Calama
1 Apr 196046.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Calama
7 Apr 196652.8SucceededBishop of Limoges, France
15 Jul 196855.1AppointedPrelate of Mission de France o Pontigny, France
22 Feb 197359.7ResignedPrelate of Mission de France o Pontigny, France
13 Jul 198875.1RetiredBishop of Limoges, France
11 Jun 200491.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Limoges, France

MicroData Summary for Henri Marie Charles Gufflet (VIAF: 61670659)
Bishop Henri Marie Charles Gufflet (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Limoges

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVersailles, Diocese of Versailles
Ordained PriestSaint-Louis, Cathedral, Versailles, Diocese of Versailles

  • a priest for 67.9 years
  • a bishop for 44.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1960, Number 26
  • ab/prel/mdfp: Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 60, Page 581
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)
  • opd/c1: AJ, 8 Nov 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast