Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre René Ferdinand Raffin, O.P.

Bishop Emeritus of Metz, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Feb 1938 Born
12 Nov 195719.7ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
21 Dec 196325.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Friars Preachers
5 Jul 196426.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
4 Aug 198749.4AppointedBishop of Metz, France
11 Oct 198749.6Ordained BishopBishop of Metz, France
27 Sep 201375.6RetiredBishop of Metz, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre René Ferdinand Raffin (VIAF: 47493)
Bishop Pierre René Ferdinand Raffin O.P. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Metz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNancy, Diocese of Nancy (-Toul)
Ordained DeaconSt-Sulpice, Church, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained PriestLe Saulchoir, Convent, Étiolles, Diocese of Versailles
Ordained BishopSaint-Étienne, Cathedral, Metz, Diocese of Metz

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Metz.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Number 9,162
  • r: Bollettino, 27 Sep 2013
  • r: CB, 8 Oct 2013
  • c1: AJ, 8 Nov 2017
  • od/c0/loc: AJ, 3 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast