Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop André Rousset

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Pontoise, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jul 1918Born
25 Mar 194425.6Ordained PriestPriest of Versailles, France
7 Feb 196344.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Versailles, France
7 Feb 196344.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Vaga
30 Mar 196344.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vaga
9 Oct 196648.2AppointedBishop of Pontoise, France
19 Nov 198870.3ResignedBishop of Pontoise, France
26 Dec 199476.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Pontoise, France

MicroData Summary for André Rousset
Bishop André Rousset (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Pontoise

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCrest
Ordained PriestSaint-Louis, Cathedral, Versailles, Diocese of Versailles

  • a priest for 50.7 years
  • a bishop for 31.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1963
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)
  • opd/c1: AJ, 8 Nov 2017
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 81, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast