Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gérard-Maurice-Eugène Huyghe

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Arras (-Boulogne-Saint-Omer), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Aug 1909Born
17 Dec 193223.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Lille, France
29 Jun 193323.8Ordained PriestPriest of Lille, France
15 Dec 196152.2AppointedBishop of Arras (-Boulogne-Saint-Omer), France
11 Apr 196252.6Ordained BishopBishop of Arras (-Boulogne-Saint-Omer), France
25 Sep 198475.0RetiredBishop of Arras (-Boulogne-Saint-Omer), France
27 Oct 200192.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Arras (-Boulogne-Saint-Omer), France

MicroData Summary for Gérard-Maurice-Eugène Huyghe (VIAF: 161655265)
Bishop Gérard-Maurice-Eugène Huyghe (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Arras (-Boulogne-Saint-Omer)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFives-Lille, Diocese of Lille
Ordained DeaconSaint-Sulpice, Church, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained PriestSaint-Sulpice, Church, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame de la Treille, Cathedral, Lille, Diocese of Lille
Death PlaceArras, Diocese of Arras (-Boulogne-Saint-Omer)

  • a priest for 68.3 years
  • a bishop for 39.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 30
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Necrology (back)
  • od/c01/loc: AJ, 17 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 27 Jul 2018

Quantcast