Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Albert-Georges-Yves Malbois

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Corbeil, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Nov 1915Born
29 Jun 193822.6Ordained PriestPriest of Versailles, France
9 Mar 196145.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Versailles, France
9 Mar 196145.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Altava
22 Apr 196145.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Altava
9 Oct 196650.8AppointedBishop of Corbeil, France
13 Sep 197761.8ResignedBishop of Corbeil, France
12 Feb 2017101.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Corbeil, France

MicroData Summary for Albert-Georges-Yves Malbois
Bishop Albert-Georges-Yves Malbois (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Corbeil

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVersailles, Diocese of Versailles
Ordained PriestSaint-Louis, Cathedral, Versailles, Diocese of Versailles
Death PlaceSaint-Germain-en-Laye

  • a priest for 78.6 years
  • a bishop for 55.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: CB, 13 Feb 2017
  • c1: AJ, 8 Nov 2017
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast