Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Élie Eugène François Vandewalle

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Versailles, France

Titular Bishop of Olbia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Apr 1901Born
2 Jun 192827.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Versailles, France
22 Dec 192827.6Ordained PriestPriest of Versailles, France
23 Aug 195857.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Versailles, France
23 Aug 195857.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Olbia
18 Nov 195857.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Olbia
7 Dec 196059.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Versailles, France

MicroData Summary for Élie Eugène François Vandewalle
Bishop Élie Eugène François Vandewalle (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Versailles

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBailleul, Nord, Archdiocese of Cambrai
Ordained DeaconSeminary St-Sulpice, Chapel, Issy-les-Moulineaux, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained PriestMajor Seminary, Chapel, Versailles, Diocese of Versailles
Death PlaceÉtampes, Diocese of Versailles
Buried Place (Original)Saint-Louis, Cemetery, Versailles, Diocese of Versailles

  • a priest for 31.9 years
  • a bishop for 2.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • c1/opd/loc: AJ, 8 Nov 2017
  • od/c0/loc: AJ, 3 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 12 Jul 2018

Quantcast