Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Héctor Raphaël Quilliet

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Lille

Titular Archbishop of Sergiopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Mar 1859BornBois-Bernard
22 Sep 188122.5Ordained PriestPriest of Lille, France
24 Dec 191354.8AppointedBishop of Limoges, France
19 Mar 191455.0Ordained BishopBishop of Limoges, France
18 Jun 192061.3AppointedBishop of Lille, France
23 Mar 192869.0ResignedBishop of Lille, France
23 Mar 192869.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Sergiopolis
26 Nov 192869.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Lille, France

MicroData Summary for Héctor Raphaël Quilliet:
Archbishop Héctor Raphaël Quilliet (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Lille

  • a priest for 47.2 years
  • a bishop for 14.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1914, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013