Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John Baptist Purcell

Deceased

Archbishop of Cincinnati, Ohio, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Feb 1800Born
20 May 182626.2Ordained PriestPriest
8 Mar 183333.0AppointedBishop of Cincinnati, Ohio, USA
13 Oct 183333.6Ordained BishopBishop of Cincinnati, Ohio, USA
19 Jul 185050.3AppointedArchbishop of Cincinnati, Ohio, USA
4 Jul 188383.3DiedArchbishop of Cincinnati, Ohio, USA

MicroData Summary for John Baptist Purcell
(VIAF: 31181270; WikiData: Q172682)
Archbishop John Baptist Purcell (born , died ) Archbishop of Cincinnati

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMallow, Diocese of Cloyne and Ross, Ireland
Ordained PriestParis, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained BishopAssumption, Cathedral, Baltimore, Archdiocese of Baltimore, Maryland
Death PlaceSt. Martin, OH

  • a priest for 57.1 years
  • a bishop for 49.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 151
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1833, Number 42
  • c1: CB, 16 May 2022

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
Code: web_b, v3.3.4, 13 Nov 2022; Data: 26 Mar 2023