Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignatius Mrak

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Sault Sainte Marie and Marquette, Michigan, USA

Titular Bishop of AntinoŽ


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Oct 1810Born
31 Jul 183726.7Ordained PriestPriest
25 Sep 186857.9AppointedBishop of Sault Sainte Marie and Marquette, Michigan, USA
7 Feb 186958.3Ordained BishopBishop of Sault Sainte Marie and Marquette, Michigan, USA
28 Apr 187968.5ResignedBishop of Sault Sainte Marie and Marquette, Michigan, USA
26 Apr 188170.5AppointedTitular Bishop of AntinoŽ
2 Jan 190190.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Sault Sainte Marie and Marquette, Michigan, USA

MicroData Summary for Ignatius Mrak
Bishop Ignatius Mrak (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Sault Sainte Marie and Marquette

EventPlace
Birth PlacePolland, Diocese of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia, Austria
Ordained BishopCathedral, Cincinnati, Archdiocese of Cincinnati, Ohio

  • a priest for 63.4 years
  • a bishop for 31.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 107, and Page 368
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1869, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Jun 2017