Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Richard Gilmour

Deceased

Bishop of Cleveland, Ohio, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Sep 1824Born
15 Aug 184217.8Converted
30 Aug 185227.9Ordained PriestPriest of Cincinnati, Ohio, USA
15 Feb 187247.3AppointedBishop of Cleveland, Ohio, USA
14 Apr 187247.5Ordained BishopBishop of Cleveland, Ohio, USA
13 Apr 189166.5DiedBishop of Cleveland, Ohio, USA

MicroData Summary for Richard Gilmour (VIAF: 14510657)
Bishop Richard Gilmour (born , died ) Bishop of Cleveland

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGlasgow, Archdiocese of Glasgow, Scotland, Great Britain
Ordained BishopSt Peter in Chains, Cathedral, Cincinnati, Archdiocese of Cincinnati, Ohio

  • a priest for 38.6 years
  • a bishop for 18.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 210
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1872, Number 55

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 1 Mar 2017