Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edward Fitzgerald

Deceased

Bishop of Little Rock, Arkansas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Oct 1833BornLimerick, Ireland
22 Aug 185723.8Ordained PriestPriest
24 Apr 186632.5AppointedBishop of Little Rock, Arkansas, USA
3 Feb 186733.3Ordained BishopBishop of Little Rock, Arkansas, USA
21 Feb 190773.3DiedBishop of Little Rock, Arkansas, USA

MicroData Summary for Edward Fitzgerald:
Bishop Edward Fitzgerald (born , died ) Bishop of Little Rock

  • a priest for 49.5 years
  • a bishop for 40.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 449

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013