Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francis Patrick Kenrick

Deceased

Archbishop of Baltimore, Maryland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Dec 1797BornDublin, Ireland
7 Apr 182123.3Ordained PriestPriest
25 Feb 183032.2AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
25 Feb 183032.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Arathia
6 Jun 183032.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arathia
22 Apr 184244.3SucceededBishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
19 Aug 185153.7AppointedArchbishop of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
9 Oct 185153.8InstalledArchbishop of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
8 Jul 186365.5DiedArchbishop of Baltimore, Maryland, USA

MicroData Summary for Francis Patrick Kenrick (VIAF: 34886158)
Archbishop Francis Patrick Kenrick (born , died ) Archbishop of Baltimore

  • a priest for 42.2 years
  • a bishop for 33.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/op: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 139
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 85, and Page 305
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1830, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 19 Jul 2016