Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignatius Aloysius Reynolds

Deceased

Bishop of Charleston, South Carolina, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Aug 1798Born
24 Oct 182325.1Ordained PriestPriest of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
28 Nov 184345.2AppointedBishop of Charleston, South Carolina, USA
19 Mar 184445.5Ordained BishopBishop of Charleston, South Carolina, USA
6 Mar 185556.5DiedBishop of Charleston, South Carolina, USA

MicroData Summary for Ignatius Aloysius Reynolds (VIAF: 6183323)
Bishop Ignatius Aloysius Reynolds (born , died ) Bishop of Charleston

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBardstown, KY

  • a priest for 31.3 years
  • a bishop for 10.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 134
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1844, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast