Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Henry Luers

Deceased

Bishop of Fort Wayne, Indiana, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Sep 1819Born
11 Nov 184627.1Ordained PriestPriest of Cincinnati, Ohio, USA
22 Sep 185737.9AppointedBishop of Fort Wayne, Indiana, USA
10 Jan 185838.2Ordained BishopBishop of Fort Wayne, Indiana, USA
29 Jun 187151.7DiedBishop of Fort Wayne, Indiana, USA

MicroData Summary for John Henry Luers (VIAF: 26304730)
Bishop John Henry Luers (born , died ) Bishop of Fort Wayne

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLutten, Diocese of Münster, Germany, Germany
Ordained BishopSt. Peter, Cathedral, Cincinnati, Archdiocese of Cincinnati, Ohio

  • a priest for 24.6 years
  • a bishop for 13.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 597
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1858, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 22 Jan 2017