Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis Amadeus Rappe

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cleveland, Ohio, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1801Born
14 Mar 182928.1Ordained PriestPriest of Arras, France
23 Apr 184746.2AppointedBishop of Cleveland, Ohio, USA
10 Oct 184746.6Ordained BishopBishop of Cleveland, Ohio, USA
14 Jul 187069.4ResignedBishop of Cleveland, Ohio, USA
8 Sep 187776.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Cleveland, Ohio, USA

MicroData Summary for Louis Amadeus Rappe (VIAF: 66074242)
Bishop Louis Amadeus Rappe (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cleveland

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAudrehem, France
Ordained BishopCathedral, Cincinnati, Diocese of Cincinnati, Ohio

  • a priest for 48.4 years
  • a bishop for 29.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 210
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1847, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Feb 2017