Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Sebastian Byrne

Deceased

Bishop of Nashville, Tennessee, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jul 1841Born
22 May 186927.8Ordained PriestPriest
10 May 189452.7AppointedBishop of Nashville, Tennessee, USA
25 Jul 189452.9Ordained BishopBishop of Nashville, Tennessee, USA
4 Sep 192382.1DiedBishop of Nashville, Tennessee, USA

MicroData Summary for Thomas Sebastian Byrne (VIAF: 19532235)
Bishop Thomas Sebastian Byrne (born , died ) Bishop of Nashville

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHamilton, OH, Archdiocese of Cincinnati, Ohio
Ordained BishopSt. Joseph, Chapel, Nashville, Diocese of Nashville, Tennessee

  • a priest for 54.2 years
  • a bishop for 29.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 403
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1894, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 5 Jun 2017